TX HB3942 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to establishing a program to assist small businesses by increasing access to capital.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to establishing a program to assist small businesses by increasing access to capital.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21HouseReferred to International Relations & Economic Development
2019-03-21HouseRead first time
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2173 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback