TX HB3938 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of the industry-based certification advisory council and the transfer of certain duties to that advisory council.
Title
Relating to the establishment of the industry-based certification advisory council and the transfer of certain duties to that advisory council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1645 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#509 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#509 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Effective immediately | |
2021-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#1645 |
2021-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-28 | House | Record vote RV#509 |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed |
2021-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-27 | House | Amended 1-K. Bell |
2021-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-31 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-31 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2021-03-24 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1198 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Subjects
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Education
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
Governor
INDUSTRY-BASED CERTIFICATION ADVISORY COUNCIL
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE SYSTEM
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Education
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
Governor
INDUSTRY-BASED CERTIFICATION ADVISORY COUNCIL
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE SYSTEM
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS