TX HB3921 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to size and density requirements for residential lots in certain municipalities; authorizing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to size and density requirements for residential lots in certain municipalities; authorizing a fee.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-11HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2023-05-09HouseConsidered in Calendars
2023-05-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2023-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-05-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-04-26HouseReported favorably as substituted
2023-04-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2023-04-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-05HouseLeft pending in committee
2023-04-05HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2023-04-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-20HouseReferred to Land & Resource Management
2023-03-20HouseRead first time
2023-03-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1787 (Same As) 2023-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
SB1787 (Same As) 2023-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback