TX HB3920 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to an application to vote early by mail on the grounds of disability or confinement for childbirth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to an application to vote early by mail on the grounds of disability or confinement for childbirth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1093 (Y: 99 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenatePassed
2021-05-25SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenatePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-05-24SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Menéndez
2021-05-24SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-20SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-20SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-17SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-05-17SenateRead first time
2021-05-17SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-14HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1093
2021-05-14HousePassed
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-13HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-13HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-13HousePoint of order overruled Rule 4, Section 18, and Rule 4, Section 32(b)(9)
2021-05-13HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-05-10HousePostponed 5/13/21 10:00 AM
2021-05-10HouseAmended 2-Zwiener
2021-05-10HouseAmended 1-Goodwin
2021-05-10HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-05-10HousePostponed 5/10/21 6:15 PM
2021-05-10HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-07HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-21HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-21HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-24HouseReferred to Elections
2021-03-24HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3920
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03920I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03920H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03920E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03920S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03920F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03920H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03920H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03920S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03920I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03920H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03920H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03920E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03920E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3920&RcdVtNo=1093&Ch=H&Dt=05/14/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=40
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=41
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=146

Bill Comments

feedback