TX HB3915 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the designation of certain premises as critical load premises for electric service.
Title
Relating to the designation of certain premises as critical load premises for electric service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#795 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-06 | House | Record vote RV#795 |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed |
2021-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-05 | House | Amended 2-Goldman |
2021-05-05 | House | Amended 1-Goldman |
2021-05-05 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-05-03 | House | Postponed 5/5/21 10:00 AM |
2021-05-03 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-04-29 | House | Postponed 5/3/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Energy Resources |
2021-03-24 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |