TX HB3913 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to retainage requirements for certain public works construction projects.
Title
Relating to retainage requirements for certain public works construction projects.
Sponsors
Rep. Hugh Shine [R] | Rep. John Cyrier [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2017-04-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BUILDING CONSTRUCTION
City Government
City Government--General
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
County Government
County Government--General
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local
Purchasing--State
City Government
City Government--General
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
County Government
County Government--General
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local
Purchasing--State