TX HB3910 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of one or more supplemental county civil service commissions in certain counties.
Title
Relating to the establishment of one or more supplemental county civil service commissions in certain counties.
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Sherman [D] | Rep. Alma Allen [D] | Rep. Sheryl Cole [D] | Rep. Alex Dominguez [D] |
Sen. Royce West [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1061 (Y: 110 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1061 (Y: 110 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-15 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2019-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | House | Record vote RV#1061 |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-06 | House | Amendment withdrawn 2-Perez |
2019-05-06 | House | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2, Rule 11, Section 3, and Rule 8, Section 10(b) |
2019-05-06 | House | Amendment(s) offered 2-Perez |
2019-05-06 | House | Amended 1-Sherman |
2019-05-06 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 10(b) |
2019-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-16 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB126 (Same As) 2019-02-01 - Referred to State Affairs