TX HB3902 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration, powers, and duties of the Fort Bend County Municipal Utility District No. 134.
Title
Relating to the administration, powers, and duties of the Fort Bend County Municipal Utility District No. 134.
Sponsors
Rep. John Zerwas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-23 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-17 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2013-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2013-04-08 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-28 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2013-03-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
FORT BEND COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 134
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB3902 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB03902I.htm |