TX HB39 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to guardianships for incapacitated persons and to substitutes for guardianships for certain adults with disabilities.
Title
Relating to guardianships for incapacitated persons and to substitutes for guardianships for certain adults with disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-18 - House - HB 39Third Reading House (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-05-29 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-20 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-19 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-19 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-18 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-18 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-18 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-11 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-11 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-11 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-21 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed as amended |
2015-04-21 | House | Amended |
2015-04-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-20 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-16 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2015-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
GUARDIANS & WARDS
Lawyers
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts
STATE BAR OF TEXAS
SUPPORTED DECISION-MAKING AGREEMENT ACT
GUARDIANS & WARDS
Lawyers
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts
STATE BAR OF TEXAS
SUPPORTED DECISION-MAKING AGREEMENT ACT