TX HB3896 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation and operations of a health care provider participation program by the Bexar County Hospital District.
Title
Relating to the creation and operations of a health care provider participation program by the Bexar County Hospital District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-03 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-26 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-20 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1545 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Subjects
BEXAR COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Health Care Providers
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Health Care Providers
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital