TX HB3861 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-24 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-24 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the titling and registration of motor vehicles by motor vehicle dealers.
Title
Relating to the titling and registration of motor vehicles by motor vehicle dealers.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Goldman [R] | Sen. Phil King [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#791 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#791 |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-04-28 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-19 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2023-03-20 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTORS
Electronic Information Systems
MOTOR VEHICLE DEALERS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Electronic Information Systems
MOTOR VEHICLE DEALERS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration