TX HB3859 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 55-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to protection of the rights of conscience for child welfare services providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to protection of the rights of conscience for child welfare services providers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1117 (Y: 93 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1110 (Y: 94 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1109 (Y: 57 N: 90 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1108 (Y: 56 N: 91 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1107 (Y: 55 N: 88 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1106 (Y: 54 N: 91 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1105 (Y: 56 N: 90 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - House - Amendment to amendment tabled RV#1104 (Y: 91 N: 55 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-22HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-22SenateStatement(s) submitted
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenatePassed
2017-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-21SenateRecord vote
2017-05-21SenatePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-21SenateRecord vote
2017-05-21SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-21SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-21SenateRecord vote
2017-05-21SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-21SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-21SenateRecord vote
2017-05-21SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-21SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-21SenateRecord vote
2017-05-21SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-21SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-21SenateRecord vote
2017-05-21SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-21SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-21SenateRecord vote
2017-05-21SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-21SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-21SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-21SenateRecord vote
2017-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-18SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-11SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-05-11SenateRead first time
2017-05-11SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-10HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10HouseRecord vote
2017-05-10HousePassed
2017-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-09HouseAmendment withdrawn
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-09HousePoint of order overruled
2017-05-09HousePoint of order overruled
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-09HousePoint of order overruled
2017-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-09HouseAmended
2017-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HouseAmendment to amendment tabled
2017-05-09HouseAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-09HouseAmended
2017-05-09HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-08HousePostponed
2017-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-27HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-27HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-14HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-03-14HouseRead first time
2017-03-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3859
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03859I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03859H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03859E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03859S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03859F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3859&RcdVtNo=1104&Ch=H&Dt=05/09/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3859&RcdVtNo=1105&Ch=H&Dt=05/09/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3859&RcdVtNo=1106&Ch=H&Dt=05/09/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3859&RcdVtNo=1107&Ch=H&Dt=05/09/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3859&RcdVtNo=1108&Ch=H&Dt=05/09/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3859&RcdVtNo=1109&Ch=H&Dt=05/09/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3859&RcdVtNo=1110&Ch=H&Dt=05/09/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3859&RcdVtNo=1117&Ch=H&Dt=05/10/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-21-F2.PDF#page=18
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-21-F2.PDF#page=19
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-22-F1.PDF#page=2
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-21-F2.PDF#page=20

Bill Comments

feedback