TX HB3854 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the movement of certain vehicles transporting an intermodal shipping container; authorizing a fee; creating an offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the movement of certain vehicles transporting an intermodal shipping container; authorizing a fee; creating an offense.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2017-05-10HouseCompanion considered in lieu of
2017-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-04HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-20HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-30HouseReferred to Transportation
2017-03-30HouseRead first time
2017-03-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback