TX HB385 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the elimination of certain formula funding and dropped course restrictions for students enrolled in accelerated, affordable baccalaureate programs at public institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the elimination of certain formula funding and dropped course restrictions for students enrolled in accelerated, affordable baccalaureate programs at public institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#811 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-05SenateReferred to Higher Education
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HousePassed
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-03HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-28HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-19HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-05HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-05HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-16HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-02-16HouseRead first time
2016-11-16HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback