TX HB3848 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-19 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-19 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to compensation for services and reimbursement for expenses of a member of the board of directors of the Lake View Management and Development District.
Title
Relating to compensation for services and reimbursement for expenses of a member of the board of directors of the Lake View Management and Development District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2011-05-19 | Read first time | |
2011-05-19 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-19 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-19 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-12 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-12 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-12 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-03 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-03 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-03 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-28 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-28 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2011-04-28 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-28 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-28 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-27 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | |
2011-04-26 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-26 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-13 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-04-13 | Read first time | |
2011-04-12 | Transmitted to the Governor | |
2011-04-11 | Filed |
Subjects
LAKE VIEW MANAGEMENT & DEVELOPMENT DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB3848 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB03848I.htm |