TX HB3845 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the insurance reporting program operated by the Title IV-D agency to enforce certain child support obligations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the insurance reporting program operated by the Title IV-D agency to enforce certain child support obligations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective immediately
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenatePassed
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-12SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-12SenateRead first time
2017-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HousePassed
2017-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-09HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-09HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-04HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-27HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-30HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2017-03-30HouseRead first time
2017-03-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback