TX HB3833 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 45-5)
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the appraisal of certain real property for ad valorem tax purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the appraisal of certain real property for ad valorem tax purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#901 (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-28HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenatePassed
2021-05-27SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-27SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-17SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Local Government
2021-05-12SenateRead first time
2021-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#901
2021-05-08HousePassed
2021-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-07HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-07HouseAmended 2-Deshotel
2021-05-07HouseAmended 1-Shine
2021-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-07HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-21HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-21HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-23HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2021-03-23HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3833
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03833I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03833H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03833E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03833S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03833F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03833H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03833H22.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03833I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03833H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03833E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03833E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3833&RcdVtNo=901&Ch=H&Dt=05/08/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=238

Bill Comments 750

feedback