TX HB3829 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-25 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-25 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to creating a fine arts allotment under the public school finance system.
Title
Relating to creating a fine arts allotment under the public school finance system.
Sponsors
Rep. James Talarico [D] | Rep. Ken King [R] | Rep. Ernest Bailes [R] | Rep. Harold Dutton [D] |
Rep. John Bucy [D] | Rep. John Bryant [D] | Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2023-03-20 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2084 (Same As) 2023-04-04 - Co-author authorized
SB2084 (Same As) 2023-04-04 - Co-author authorized
SB2084 (Same As) 2023-04-04 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
Arts & Humanities
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance