TX HB3807 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Fort Bend Subsidence District.
Title
Relating to the Fort Bend Subsidence District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-10 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2013-05-10 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2013-05-10 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-09 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-16 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-11 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2013-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
FORT BEND SUBSIDENCE DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous