TX HB38 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-03 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the criminal penalty for and certain civil consequences of damaging property with graffiti.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the criminal penalty for and certain civil consequences of damaging property with graffiti.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-03 Referred to Criminal Justice
2011-05-03 Read first time
2011-04-28 Received from the House
2011-04-27 Reported engrossed
2011-04-27 Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2011-04-27 Record vote
2011-04-27 Passed
2011-04-27 Read 3rd time
2011-04-26 Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2011-04-26 Passed to engrossment as amended
2011-04-26 Amended
2011-04-26 Amended
2011-04-26 Read 2nd time
2011-04-26 Placed on General State Calendar
2011-04-21 Considered in Calendars
2011-04-19 Committee report sent to Calendars
2011-04-18 Committee report distributed
2011-04-18 Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2011-04-12 Reported favorably as substituted
2011-04-12 Committee substitute considered in committee
2011-04-12 Considered in public hearing
2011-03-15 Left pending in committee
2011-03-15 Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2011-03-15 Considered in public hearing
2011-03-15 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2011-02-09 Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2011-02-09 Read first time
2010-11-08 Filed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback