TX HB3796 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-14 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-14 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to notice provided to persons with disabilities regarding the eligibility of persons with disabilities to use certain public transportation services.
Title
Relating to notice provided to persons with disabilities regarding the eligibility of persons with disabilities to use certain public transportation services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - House - HB 3796Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-12 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-12 | House | Passed |
2015-05-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-12 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-05-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-05-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-07 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-07 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-05-07 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2015-05-07 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-29 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2015-04-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2015-04-29 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2015-04-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2015-04-27 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2015-04-28 | House | Subcommittee meeting cancelled |
2015-04-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Long-term Infrastructure Planning by chair |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2015-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Human Services
Human Services--Direct Assistance
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Human Services
Human Services--Direct Assistance
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit
Transportation--Miscellaneous