TX HB3794 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-10 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-10 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of certain municipalities to impose term limits on the members of their governing bodies.
Title
Relating to the authority of certain municipalities to impose term limits on the members of their governing bodies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-08 - House - HB 3794Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-10 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-30 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-24 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-24 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2013-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
City Government--General
Elections
Elections--Candidates
TERM LIMITS
City Government--Employees/Officers
City Government--General
Elections
Elections--Candidates
TERM LIMITS