TX HB3772 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to operation of the Texas leverage fund program administered by the Texas Economic Development Bank.
Title
Relating to operation of the Texas leverage fund program administered by the Texas Economic Development Bank.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-05 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-05-05 | House | Returned to committee |
2017-05-05 | House | Point of order sustained |
2017-05-05 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-05-04 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-04 | House | Point of order withdrawn |
2017-05-04 | House | Point of order withdrawn |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2017-03-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM OFFICE, TEXAS
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT BANK, TEXAS
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM OFFICE, TEXAS
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT BANK, TEXAS
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control