TX HB377 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the issuance of certain specialty license plates, specially marked driver's licenses, and specially marked personal identification certificates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the issuance of certain specialty license plates, specially marked driver's licenses, and specially marked personal identification certificates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1911 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Read 3rd time RV#117 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Read 2nd time RV#114 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-26SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-26HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-26HouseRecord vote
2017-05-26HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-25HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-25HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-25SenateRecord vote
2017-05-25SenatePassed
2017-05-25SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-25SenateRecord vote
2017-05-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-25SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-25SenateAmended
2017-05-25SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-25SenateAmended
2017-05-25SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-25SenateAmended
2017-05-25SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-25SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-24SenateRemoved from local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-18SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-18SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-03SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-03SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2017-04-06SenateRead first time
2017-03-30SenateReceived from the House
2017-03-29HouseReported engrossed
2017-03-29HouseRecord vote
2017-03-29HousePassed
2017-03-29HouseRead 3rd time
2017-03-28HouseRecord vote
2017-03-28HousePassed to engrossment
2017-03-28HouseRead 2nd time
2017-03-28HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-03-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-03-21HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-03-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-03-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-03-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2017-02-21HouseRead first time
2016-11-16HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB377
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00377I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00377H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00377S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00377F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB377&RcdVtNo=114&Ch=H&Dt=03/28/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB377&RcdVtNo=117&Ch=H&Dt=03/29/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB377&RcdVtNo=1911&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=234

Bill Comments

feedback