TX HB3769 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of a municipality to impose a civil penalty on owners of certain motor vehicles parked on a highway under the jurisdiction of the municipality that do not display a valid registration insignia or inspection certificate.
Title
Relating to the authority of a municipality to impose a civil penalty on owners of certain motor vehicles parked on a highway under the jurisdiction of the municipality that do not display a valid registration insignia or inspection certificate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-10 - House - HB 3769Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | No action taken in committee |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-10 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-10 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-10 | House | Passed |
2013-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-10 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-10 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-10 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-09 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-05-07 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-01 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-24 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2013-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
PARKING
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
City Government--Employees/Officers
PARKING
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration