TX HB3750 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Returned from the House for further action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the applicability of certain municipal ordinances in the municipality's extraterritorial jurisdiction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the applicability of certain municipal ordinances in the municipality's extraterritorial jurisdiction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1310 (Y: 103 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateReturned from the House for further action
2019-05-24HouseReturned to the Senate for further action
2019-05-24HousePoint of order sustained Rule 11, Section 2
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-22HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateAmended
2019-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Campbell
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateAmended
2019-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Schwertner
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-22SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-13SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2019-05-13SenateRead first time
2019-05-13SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-13HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10HouseRecord vote RV#1310
2019-05-10HousePassed as amended
2019-05-10HouseAmendment withdrawn 2-Toth
2019-05-10HouseAmended 1-Israel
2019-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-09HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-09HouseAmended 2-Israel
2019-05-09HouseAmended 1-Kuempel
2019-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-30HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Land & Resource Management
2019-03-19HouseRead first time
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback