TX HB3743 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to cybersecurity and privacy regarding distance learning in public schools.
Title
Relating to cybersecurity and privacy regarding distance learning in public schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-22 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
DISTANCE EDUCATION
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Electronic Information Systems
Protection of Personal Information
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Electronic Information Systems
Protection of Personal Information
RECORDS MANAGEMENT