TX HB374 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 2 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to use of compensatory education allotment funding to provide assistance to students at risk of dropping out of school who are pregnant or who are parents and requiring reporting through the Public Education Information Management System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to use of compensatory education allotment funding to provide assistance to students at risk of dropping out of school who are pregnant or who are parents and requiring reporting through the Public Education Information Management System.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-08-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-08-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-08-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-08-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-08-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-08-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-08-03HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-08-03HouseRead first time
2017-08-02HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback