TX HB3721 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the inclusion of information for reporting suspicious activity to the Department of Public Safety on certain human trafficking signs or notices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the inclusion of information for reporting suspicious activity to the Department of Public Safety on certain human trafficking signs or notices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#297 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-04 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-04 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-19HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-19HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-19SenateRecord vote
2021-05-19SenatePassed
2021-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-19SenateRecord vote
2021-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-19SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-14SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-04-19SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#297
2021-04-16HousePassed
2021-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-16HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-16HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-16HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-08HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-31HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-31HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-03-31HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2021-03-22HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3721
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03721I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03721E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03721S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03721F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03721I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03721H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03721E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03721E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3721&RcdVtNo=297&Ch=H&Dt=04/16/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-19-F1.PDF#page=10

Bill Comments

feedback