TX HB3721 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an independent review organization to conduct reviews of certain medical necessity determinations under the Medicaid managed care program.
Title
Relating to an independent review organization to conduct reviews of certain medical necessity determinations under the Medicaid managed care program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#986 (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#986 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-02 | House | Amended 5-S. Davis |
2019-05-02 | House | Amended 4-S. Davis |
2019-05-02 | House | Amended 3-S. Davis |
2019-05-02 | House | Amended 2-S. Davis |
2019-05-02 | House | Amended 1-S. Davis |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID