TX HB3720 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing the Post Oak Savannah Groundwater Conservation District to use revenue from export fees to fund road and water infrastructure projects.
Title
Relating to authorizing the Post Oak Savannah Groundwater Conservation District to use revenue from export fees to fund road and water infrastructure projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2015-04-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-15 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2015-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-26 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2015-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
POST OAK SAVANNAH GROUNDWATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB3720 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB03720I.htm |