TX HB3706 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-02 - Left pending in subcommittee
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-02 - Left pending in subcommittee
Summary
Relating to the creation of a Tex Sun solar energy system rebate program.
Title
Relating to the creation of a Tex Sun solar energy system rebate program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-02 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-04-02 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-04-02 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | |
2009-04-02 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-04-02 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-25 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-25 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to Energy Resources | |
2009-03-19 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |
Subjects
Energy
Energy--Conservation
Energy--Solar
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
RENEWABLE ENERGY
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Energy--Conservation
Energy--Solar
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
RENEWABLE ENERGY
Utilities
Utilities--Electric