TX HB370 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to notifying a parent or guardian whether an employee of a school is appointed school marshal and the confidentiality of information submitted to or collected by the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement in connection with a certification for appointment as school marshal.
Title
Relating to notifying a parent or guardian whether an employee of a school is appointed school marshal and the confidentiality of information submitted to or collected by the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement in connection with a certification for appointment as school marshal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-03-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-03-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-03-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-02-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-02-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2015-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2014-11-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Private
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PARENTAL NOTIFICATION
Weapons
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Private
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PARENTAL NOTIFICATION
Weapons
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB370 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00370I.htm |