TX HB3697 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-12 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-12 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to notice provided by an applicant to house inmates released on parole or to mandatory supervision.
Title
Relating to notice provided by an applicant to house inmates released on parole or to mandatory supervision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1075 (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2017-03-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Housing
Housing--General
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
PUBLIC NOTICE
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Housing
Housing--General
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
PUBLIC NOTICE