TX HB3690 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the Texas Crime Stoppers Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Texas Crime Stoppers Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1833 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-12 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-25HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-25HouseRecord vote
2017-05-25HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-24HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-24HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenatePassed
2017-05-23SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateAmended
2017-05-23SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-23SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-23SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-23SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-08SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-05-08SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HousePassed
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-04HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-28HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-18HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-11HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-31HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2017-03-31HouseRead first time
2017-03-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3690
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03690I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03690H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03690E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03690S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03690F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3690&RcdVtNo=735&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3690&RcdVtNo=1833&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-23-F.PDF#page=53
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-23-F.PDF#page=54

Bill Comments

feedback