TX HB3682 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring the statewide health coordinating council and state health plan to examine and report on the impact of low health literacy on consumers and the health care system.
Title
Relating to requiring the statewide health coordinating council and state health plan to examine and report on the impact of low health literacy on consumers and the health care system.
Sponsors
Rep. Diana Arevalo [D] | Rep. Garnet Coleman [D] | Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] | Rep. Nicole Collier [D] |
Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2017-03-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed |