TX HB3682 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-13 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-13 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the categorization and resolution of violations of laws enforced by the Texas Ethics Commission.
Title
Relating to the categorization and resolution of violations of laws enforced by the Texas Ethics Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-08 - House - HB 3682Third Reading House (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-08 | House | Passed |
2015-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-06 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics |
2015-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | House | Filed |