TX HB367 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to donation and distribution of surplus food at public schools and grace period policies for public school students with insufficient balances on prepaid meal cards.
Title
Relating to donation and distribution of surplus food at public schools and grace period policies for public school students with insufficient balances on prepaid meal cards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#345 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#317 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#317 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-21 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-20 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-04-20 | House | Amended |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-19 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | House | Constitutional three day rule suspended |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-02-16 | House | Read first time |
2016-11-15 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
FOOD
GIFTS & DONATIONS
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
FOOD
GIFTS & DONATIONS