TX HB3668 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the definition of peace officer for purposes of intercepting or collecting information in relation to certain communications in an investigation conducted by an arson investigating unit.
Title
Relating to the definition of peace officer for purposes of intercepting or collecting information in relation to certain communications in an investigation conducted by an arson investigating unit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - HB 3668Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-10 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-07 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-07 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-31 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-31 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2015-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ARSON
CRIMINAL INVESTIGATIONS
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Law Enforcement
PEACE OFFICERS
CRIMINAL INVESTIGATIONS
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Law Enforcement
PEACE OFFICERS