TX HB3651 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-13 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-13 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the manufacture, sale, distribution, possession, and use of drugs not approved by the United States Food and Drug Administration and the false representation that a substance is a drug approved by the United States Food and Drug Administration or intended for the prevention or treatment of diseases in humans; creating criminal offenses.
Title
Relating to the manufacture, sale, distribution, possession, and use of drugs not approved by the United States Food and Drug Administration and the false representation that a substance is a drug approved by the United States Food and Drug Administration or intended for the prevention or treatment of diseases in humans; creating criminal offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - House - HB 3651Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-12 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-12 | House | Passed |
2015-05-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-12 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-12 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-05-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-05-05 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-30 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2015-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Crimes--Drugs
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions