TX HB365 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of eminent domain authority by certain municipalities to take abandoned multi-family rental buildings.
Title
Relating to the use of eminent domain authority by certain municipalities to take abandoned multi-family rental buildings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-17 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-16 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time | |
2011-04-14 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-14 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-13 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-13 | Record vote | |
2011-04-13 | Passed | |
2011-04-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-12 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-12 | Record vote | |
2011-04-12 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-04-12 | Amended | |
2011-04-12 | Amended | |
2011-04-12 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-04-11 | Postponed | |
2011-04-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-11 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-03-31 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-03-30 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-30 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-22 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-07 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | |
2011-02-16 | Read first time | |
2010-12-02 | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
CONDEMNATION
Property Interests
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
City Government--General
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
CONDEMNATION
Property Interests
Property Interests--Eminent Domain