TX HB3644 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the establishment of a memorial monument dedicated to emergency medical services personnel on the Capitol grounds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the establishment of a memorial monument dedicated to emergency medical services personnel on the Capitol grounds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#417 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-04 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-04 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-19HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-19HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-19SenateRecord vote
2021-05-19SenatePassed
2021-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-19SenateRecord vote
2021-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-10SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-10SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-04SenateReferred to Administration
2021-05-04SenateRead first time
2021-04-26SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-23HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-23HouseRecord vote RV#417
2021-04-23HousePassed
2021-04-23HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-23HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-23HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-20HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-14HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-06HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-06HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2021-03-22HouseRead first time
2021-03-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3644
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03644I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03644H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03644E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03644S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03644F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03644I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03644H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03644H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03644E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03644E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3644&RcdVtNo=417&Ch=H&Dt=04/23/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-19-F1.PDF#page=9

Bill Comments 750

feedback