TX HB3627 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of a governmental body impacted by a catastrophe to temporarily suspend the requirements of the public information law.
Title
Relating to the authority of a governmental body impacted by a catastrophe to temporarily suspend the requirements of the public information law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-10 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1225 |
2021-05-07 | House | Postponed 5/10/21 10:00 AM |
2021-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Open Meetings
Open Records
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Open Meetings
Open Records
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions