TX HB362 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of a county to require electronic bids or proposals for competitive bidding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of a county to require electronic bids or proposals for competitive bidding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#132 (Y: 134 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-13SenateReferred to Local Government
2021-04-13SenateRead first time
2021-04-12SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-09HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-09HouseRecord vote RV#132
2021-04-09HousePassed
2021-04-09HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-09HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-09HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-09HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-03-29HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-03-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-23HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-23HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-03-23HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-23HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-02-25HouseReferred to County Affairs
2021-02-25HouseRead first time
2020-11-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB326 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback