TX HB362 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the procedure for rearrest and adjustment of the bond amount in certain criminal cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the procedure for rearrest and adjustment of the bond amount in certain criminal cases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#946 (Y: 136 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-05-09SenateRead first time
2017-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HousePassed
2017-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-05HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-03-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-03-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-03-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-16HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-02-16HouseRead first time
2016-11-15HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback