TX HB362 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation by a property owners' association of the installation of solar energy devices and certain roofing materials on property.
Title
Relating to the regulation by a property owners' association of the installation of solar energy devices and certain roofing materials on property.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Burkett [R] | Rep. Gary Elkins [R] | Rep. Jim Jackson [R] | Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] |
Rep. Burt Solomons [R] | Rep. Randy Weber [R] | Sen. Royce West [D] | Rep. Paul Workman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-30 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-30 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-29 | House adopts resolution to go outside bounds | |
2011-05-29 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-29 | Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds | |
2011-05-28 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-28 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-28 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-28 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-28 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-28 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2011-05-27 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-27 | House requests conference committee | |
2011-05-27 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-25 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-25 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-16 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-04-20 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2011-04-20 | Read first time | |
2011-04-12 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-11 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-11 | Record vote | |
2011-04-11 | Passed | |
2011-04-11 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-08 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-08 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-04-08 | Amended | |
2011-04-08 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-08 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-01 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-01 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-01 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-28 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-28 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-21 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-21 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2011-03-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-21 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-02-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-02-28 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-02-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-02-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2011-02-16 | Read first time | |
2010-12-01 | Filed |