TX HB3619 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-24 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-24 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibiting the investment of the permanent university fund, the national research university fund, or money held by a public institution of higher education in financial companies that boycott certain energy companies.
Title
Relating to prohibiting the investment of the permanent university fund, the national research university fund, or money held by a public institution of higher education in financial companies that boycott certain energy companies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2023-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1489 (Same As) 2023-05-10 - Referred to Higher Education
SB1489 (Same As) 2023-05-10 - Referred to Higher Education
SB1489 (Same As) 2023-05-10 - Referred to Higher Education
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Energy
Energy--General
PERMANENT UNIVERSITY FUND
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Energy
Energy--General
PERMANENT UNIVERSITY FUND
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations