TX HB3607 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to nonsubstantive additions to, revisions of, and corrections in enacted codes, to the nonsubstantive codification or disposition of various laws omitted from enacted codes, and to conforming codifications enacted by the 86th Legislature to other Acts of that legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to nonsubstantive additions to, revisions of, and corrections in enacted codes, to the nonsubstantive codification or disposition of various laws omitted from enacted codes, and to conforming codifications enacted by the 86th Legislature to other Acts of that legislature.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#898 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenatePassed
2021-05-27SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-27SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-11SenateReferred to Administration
2021-05-11SenateRead first time
2021-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#898
2021-05-08HousePassed
2021-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-08HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-08HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-30HouseReturned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
2021-04-30HouseWithdrawn from calendar (by author)
2021-04-30HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-20HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-08HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-31HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2021-03-22HouseRead first time
2021-03-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback