TX HB3607 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-10 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-10 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to construction managers-at-risk used by local governments.
Title
Relating to construction managers-at-risk used by local governments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-09 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-09 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-04 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-20 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2011-03-23 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed |
Subjects
BUILDING CONSTRUCTION
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
County Government--General
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
County Government--General