TX HB359 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-14)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to recovery under uninsured and underinsured motorist insurance coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to recovery under uninsured and underinsured motorist insurance coverage.

Sponsors

Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]
Rep. Julie Johnson [D]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]
Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Michelle Beckley [D]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D]
Rep. John Bucy [D]Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Sheryl Cole [D]Rep. Garnet Coleman [D]
Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]Rep. Jasmine Crockett [D]Rep. Yvonne Davis [D]
Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]Rep. Alex Dominguez [D]Rep. Harold Dutton [D]
Rep. Art Fierro [D]Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Jessica Gonzalez [D]Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]
Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]
Rep. Celia Israel [D]Rep. Ann Johnson [D]Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]
Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Tracy King [D]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]
Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. Ray Lopez [D]Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]Rep. Armando Martinez [D]
Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D]Rep. Terry Meza [D]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]
Rep. Joseph Moody [D]Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D]Rep. Christina Morales [D]Rep. Eddie Morales [D]
Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Claudia Ordaz Perez [D]Rep. Lina Ortega [D]
Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]Rep. Mary Perez [D]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D]
Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]
Rep. Toni Rose [D]Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D]Rep. Carl Sherman [D]Rep. James Talarico [D]
Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]Rep. Chris Turner [D]Rep. John Turner [D]Rep. Hubert Vo [D]
Rep. Armando Walle [D]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Insurance
2021-02-25HouseRead first time
2020-11-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1935 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB1935 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback